This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/18/2022 at 19:03:29 (UTC).

GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0285

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINER, MELISSA R

SABEN, ADAM B

GAZECKA, JULIA E

Defendant Attorney

GAGNON, DAVID M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE RE APPLICATION OF MEDICARE PART B FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • HearingDate time: 2/16/2022 1:00 PM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT RE APPLICATION OF MEDICARE PART B FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/20/2022; Receipt Number: 2022004815; Applied Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 02/16/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022004815

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: WINER, MELISSA R ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gagnon, David Michael