This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/18/2022 at 19:02:52 (UTC).

GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC vs. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0288

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GAZECKA, JULIA E

SABEN, ADAM B

WINER, MELISSA R

Defendant Attorney

SAAD, CHRISTINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE RE APPLICATION OF MEDICARE PART B FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: SAAD, CHRISTINA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ADDRESS AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL PURSUANT TO FRJA 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLA STAT 90.202(9) OF FLORIDA STATUTE 626.877 FLA STAT 90.202(9) OF FLORIDA STATUTE 626.878 AND FLA STAT 90.202(9) OF RULE 698-220.201

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/20/2022; Receipt Number: 2022004845; Applied Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 02/16/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022004845

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: WINER, MELISSA R ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/18/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 SC 000288

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAAD, CHRISTINA