This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/18/2022 at 19:01:52 (UTC).

GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0293

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GAZECKA, JULIA E

WINER, MELISSA R

SABEN, ADAM B

Defendant Attorney

GAGNON, DAVID M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO PERMIT ADDITIONAL REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS WITH RESPECT TO "STANDING" ISSUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES WITH RESPECT TO "STANDING"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE WITH RESPECT TO "STANDING" ISSUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS WITH RESPECT TO "STANDING"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PERMIT ADDITIONAL REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS RE: DEFENDANT'S "DEMAND LETTER" AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES RE: DEFENDANT'S "DEMAND LETTER" AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE RE: DEFENDANT'S "DEMAND LETTER" AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS RE: DEFENDANT'S "DEMAND LETTER" AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/20/2022; Receipt Number: 2022004889; Applied Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 02/16/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022004889

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: WINER, MELISSA R ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/18/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 SC 000293

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gagnon, David Michael