This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/18/2022 at 19:02:28 (UTC).

GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC vs. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0290

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GULF COAST PAIN CONSULTANTS LLC

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINER, MELISSA R

SABEN, ADAM B

GAZECKA, JULIA E

Defendant Attorney

LAMONTAGNE, RACHEL M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE RE APPLICATION OF MEDICARE PART B FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLA STAT 90.202(9) OF FLORIDA STATUTE 626.877, FLA STAT 90.202(9) OF FLORIDA STATUTE 626.878, AND FLA STAT 90.202(9) OF RULE 698-220.201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT RE: APPLICATION OF MEDICARE PART B FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (02/16/2022 PTC) - INSURANCE COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/20/2022; Receipt Number: 2022004866; Applied Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 02/16/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022004866

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: WINER, MELISSA R ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMONTAGNE , RACHEL M