This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/19/2023 at 19:03:23 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF: MOORE, CHRISTOPHER S

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 GUARDIANSHIP OF MOORE, CHRISTOPHER S was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are [ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL and BOLES, W.. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0114

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

[ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL

BOLES, W.. JOEL

 

Party Details

Applicants and Not Yet Classified

HARDISTY, DANIELLE R

HARDISTY, KIMBALL B

MOORE, CHRISTOPHER S

MOORE, SCOTT DOUGLAS

Interested Party and Not Yet Classified

MOORE, SCOTT DOUGLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

MERRITT, LAUREN ASHLEY

GUTTMANN, STEPHEN M

GREEN, JAMES R JR

Not Yet Classified and Interested Party Attorney

GREEN, JAMES R JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketTEMPORARY LETTERS OF GRDN ADVOCATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY CO-GAURDIAN ADVOCATES AND WAIVING BOND, CREDIT HISTORY INVESTIGATIONS, LEVEL 2 BACKGROUND SCREENINGS, AND ANNUAL ACCOUNTINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDate time: 2/14/2023 11:00 AM; Event: HEARING; Judge: BOLES, W.. JOEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketANSWER AND COUNTER PETITION FOR GUARDIAN ADVOCATE - SCOTT D MOORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO SERVE AS GUARDIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN AND DESIGNATION OF AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE - SCOTT D MOORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING ATTY AND ELISOR FOR WARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 11/21/2022; Receipt Number: 2022086786; Applied Amount: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022086786

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPT OF CO GUARDIAN ADVOCATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN AND DESIGNATION OF AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE - KIMBALL HARDISTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN AND DESIGNATION OF AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE - DANIELLE HARDISTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO SERVE AS GUARDIAN - KIMBALL HARDISTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO SERVE AS GUARDIAN - DANIELLE HARDISTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W.. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/21/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 GA 000114

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less