This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 12/18/2022 at 18:25:15 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF: BELSER, PAULA

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 GUARDIANSHIP OF BELSER, PAULA was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are [ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL, BOLES, W. JOEL and BOLES, W JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0101

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

[ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL

BOLES, W. JOEL

BOLES, W JOEL

 

Party Details

Applicant

SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA

Not Yet Classified

BELSER, PAULA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MOSLEY, CHANEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • HearingDate time: 12/27/2022 1:30 PM; Event: INCAPACITATED HEARING; Judge: BOLES, W. JOEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketINCAPACITATED HEARING SET FOR 12/27/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN / , JDG: BOLES, W. JOEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 12/27/2022 @ 1:30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingDate time: 11/15/2022 1:30 PM; Event: INCAPACITATED HEARING; Judge: BOLES, W JOEL; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING IN THE INCAPACITY PROCEEDIG RELATED TO PETT TO DETERMINE INCAPACITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN AND DESIGNATION OF AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION TO SERVE AS GUARDIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 11/15/2022 @ 1:30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PETITIONS IN THE GUARDIANSHIP PROCEEDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO APPOINT EXAMINING COMMITTEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO APPOINT ATTY AND ELISOR FOR WARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 10/19/2022; Receipt Number: 2022078622; Applied Amount: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketINCAPACITATED HEARING SET FOR 11/15/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: BOLES, W JOEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022078622

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPT OF PLENARY GUARDIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/19/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 GA 000101

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANEL MOSLEY