This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/15/2021 at 15:08:09 (UTC).

Groom: VAUGHAN, KEVIN DEWEY, Bride: MCGINTY, KAMRYN ALEXIS

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Groom VAUGHAN, KEVIN DEWEY, Bride MCGINTY, KAMRYN ALEXIS was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2177

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

MCGINTY, KAMRYN ALEXIS

VAUGHAN, KEVIN DEWEY

WILLIAM C WATTS, PASTOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketLICENSE RETURNED TO BE RECORDED - Recorded (OR.8635.542 / 2021110625)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY MAILED #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketLICENSE RETURNED TO BE RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/17/2021; Receipt Number: 2021072062; Applied Amount: $86.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $86.00 RECEIPT #2021072062

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMARRIAGE LICENSE APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 ML 002177

    Read MoreRead Less