This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 17:06:11 (UTC).

Groom: HARDY, KEITH DANIEL, Bride: EL BARCHE PALMERA, ALEJANDRO JOSE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Groom HARDY, KEITH DANIEL, Bride EL BARCHE PALMERA, ALEJANDRO JOSE was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1908

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

HARDY, KEITH DANIEL

EL BARCHE PALMERA, ALEJANDRO JOSE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 ML 001908

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/24/2020; Receipt Number: 2020063752; Applied Amount: $89.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S MEMO- KEITH STATED HE WAS SCHEDULED ALREADY FOR FRIDAY ON 09/25 @1:00 PM W/KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $89.00 RECEIPT #2020063752

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMARRIAGE LICENSE APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less