This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/15/2021 at 15:09:26 (UTC).

Groom: BRYANT, DAVID CRAIG, Bride: LUKENS, ELIZABETH MOORE

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Groom BRYANT, DAVID CRAIG, Bride LUKENS, ELIZABETH MOORE was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2168

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

LUKENS, ELIZABETH MOORE

BRYANT, DAVID CRAIG

STEPHEN L SPEIRS PASTOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketLICENSE RETURNED TO BE RECORDED - Recorded (OR.8634.1081 / 2021110224)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY MAILED #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketLICENSE RETURNED TO BE RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/17/2021; Receipt Number: 2021071817; Applied Amount: $89.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $89.00 RECEIPT #2021071817

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMARRIAGE LICENSE APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 ML 002168

    Read MoreRead Less