This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 09/10/2021 at 18:17:01 (UTC).

GOODWIN, JAMIE NICOLE vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 GOODWIN, JAMIE NICOLE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHACKELFORD, JAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2208

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHACKELFORD, JAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOODWIN, JAMIE NICOLE

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SELLERS, DAVID LEE

Defendant Attorney

BOWEN-HENTGES, JESSICA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 7/13/2021; Receipt Number: 2021054343; Applied Amount: $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021054343

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketJUELEE@DAVIDLEESELLERS.COM, DAVID@DAVIDLEESELLERS.COM, SERVICE.JMB@HEATHRASKY.COM, MJS@HEATRASKY.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: SELLERS, DAVID LEE ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/12/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002208

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JESSICA M BOWEN-HENTGES