This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/27/2023 at 19:21:50 (UTC).

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION vs. SIMMONS, JAMES

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SIMMONS, JAMES. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0168

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

SIMMONS, JAMES

HALL-SIMMONS, JONELL TAMIKA

BRIGANTINE PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION OF PENSACOLA INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAEED, AAMIR

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/12/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO THE REASONABLENESS OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS FEES

3/24/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO THE REASONABLENESS OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS FEES

AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT

3/23/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

3/23/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

3/23/2023: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON THE LAST OF ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS

3/17/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON THE LAST OF ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED ON 3/14/2023 AS TO BRIGANTINE PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION OF PENSACOLA, INC. AND JONELL TAMIKA HALL-SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL TAMIK SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL T. SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL HALL

3/7/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED ON 3/14/2023 AS TO BRIGANTINE PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION OF PENSACOLA, INC. AND JONELL TAMIKA HALL-SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL TAMIK SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL T. SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL HALL

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS

3/7/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT

3/7/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

1/27/2023: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

PROPOSED SUMMONS

1/27/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

1/27/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

1/27/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

1/27/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

1/27/2023: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

1/27/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

1/27/2023: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/27/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO THE REASONABLENESS OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE OF COMPLAINT ON THE LAST OF ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED ON 3/14/2023 AS TO BRIGANTINE PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION OF PENSACOLA, INC. AND JONELL TAMIKA HALL-SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL TAMIK SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL T. SIMMONS A/K/A JONELL HALL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING COPY OF ANSWER BY JAMES SIMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/27/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 000168

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less