This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/24/2023 at 15:09:38 (UTC).

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION vs. SIMMONS, JAMES

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SIMMONS, JAMES. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0168

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

SIMMONS, JAMES

HALL-SIMMONS, JONELL TAMIKA

BRIGANTINE PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION OF PENSACOLA INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAEED, AAMIR

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

2/16/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

2/16/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

2/16/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

2/16/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.8926.1982 / 2023009619)

2/8/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.8926.1982 / 2023009619)

ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

1/31/2023: ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

1/27/2023: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

PROPOSED SUMMONS

1/27/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

1/27/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

1/27/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

1/27/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

1/27/2023: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

1/27/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

1/27/2023: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.8926.1982 / 2023009619)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/31/2023; Receipt Number: 2023007224; Applied Amount: $959.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/27/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 000168

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less