This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 08/06/2022 at 18:40:33 (UTC).

FOSTER, LINDA vs. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 FOSTER, LINDA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ F-CIVIL ] BRODERSEN, AMY P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1078

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ F-CIVIL ] BRODERSEN, AMY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FOSTER, LINDA

FOSTER, DAVID

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABREU, ARTURO

Defendant Attorneys

DIMARCO, ROBERT SHAUN

HUXTABLE, JAKE DAVID MR

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

6/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 7/27/2022; Receipt Number: 2022056359; Applied Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $8.00 RECEIPT #2022056359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketINITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: DIMARCO, ROBERT SHAUN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketRDIMARCO@KELLEYKRONENBERG.COM; ALAST@KELLEYKRONENBERG.COM; KKYLE@KELLEYKRONENBERG.COM; JDHESERVICE@KELLEYKRONENBERG.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022043831

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketARTURO@AALEGAL.US, GRETCHEN@AALEGAL.US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: ABREU, ARTURO ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/07/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001078

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Integrity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIMARCO , ROBERT S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUXTABLE , JAKE DAVID