This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 08/26/2021 at 19:31:32 (UTC).

FOSTER, BRENDA OLENE vs. SANDERS, ANGELIA NICOLE

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 FOSTER, BRENDA OLENE filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against SANDERS, ANGELIA NICOLE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCIVER (YL), KEITH A and MILLER, JOHN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1954

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCIVER (YL), KEITH A

MILLER, JOHN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FOSTER, BRENDA OLENE

Respondents

SANDERS, ANGELIA NICOLE

REYNOLDS, MARC EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

YORK, LISA K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 7/15/2021; Receipt Number: 2021055306; Applied Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2021055306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMILLER, JOHN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND CONSENT FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY EXTENDED FAMILY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketLISAYORK@LISAYORKLAW.COM, INFO@LISAYORKLAW.COM, YORKLISA@COX.NET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER'S ATTORNEY: YORK, LISA K ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 6/11/2021; Receipt Number: 2021045113; Applied Amount: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketFIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2021045113

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER'S NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER'S UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR TEMPORARY CUSTODY BY FAMILY MEMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING APPLICANT IS NOT INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketFIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $12.10 RECEIPT #2021041050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMCIVER (YL), KEITH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/28/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 001954

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YORK, LISA K