This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/14/2021 at 15:53:09 (UTC).

FLORIDA STATE EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs. STULL, KRISTINA

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 FLORIDA STATE EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against STULL, KRISTINA. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRODERSEN, AMY P and YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3127

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRODERSEN, AMY P

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA STATE EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

STULL, KRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMPSON, JESSICA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.8438.620 / 2021001189)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTORNEY TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT PL $5911.02 - Recorded (OR.8425.1437 / 2020110887)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT PL $5911.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 7/12/2019; Receipt Number: 2019062988; Applied Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019062988

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: THOMPSON, JESSICA A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/12/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CC 003127

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA STATE EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON, JESSICA A