This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/26/2022 at 18:13:14 (UTC).

FLORIDA HOME EXPERTS vs. ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 FLORIDA HOME EXPERTS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are [ V ] KINSEY, PAT and KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5256

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

[ V ] KINSEY, PAT

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA HOME EXPERTS

Defendant

ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARGAS, ANDREW J

Defendant Attorney

DEGROTTOLE, CHRISTOPHER M

 

Court Documents

COVERSHEET

9/26/2022: COVERSHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/26/2022: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • HearingDate time: 11/18/2022 10:00 AM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM; Result: PRE-TRIAL HEARING HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: DEGROTTOLE, CHRISTOPHER M ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/29/2022; Receipt Number: 2022073460; Applied Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 11/18/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022073460

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: VARGAS, ANDREW J ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/27/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 SC 005256

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER M DEGROTTOLE