This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/17/2020 at 00:47:35 (UTC).

DULANEY, KENISSA vs. WILLIAMS, AMINATA

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 DULANEY, KENISSA filed an Other lawsuit against WILLIAMS, AMINATA. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY and NOBLES, LINDA L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0074

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY

NOBLES, LINDA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DULANEY, KENISSA

Defendants

MILBURN, RAYMOND

WILLIAMS, AMINATA

MILBURN, PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY, KELLY D

Defendant Attorney

OBERHAUSEN, DANA L

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

2/26/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF KENISSA DULANEY

2/26/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF KENISSA DULANEY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FROM AMINATA WILLIAMS

2/26/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FROM AMINATA WILLIAMS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/17/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/26/2020: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF KENISSA DULANEY

2/26/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF KENISSA DULANEY

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2020004810

1/17/2020: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2020004810

EMAIL DESIGNATION.

1/17/2020: EMAIL DESIGNATION.

COMPLAINT

1/17/2020: COMPLAINT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.8288.506 / 2020035008)

4/30/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.8288.506 / 2020035008)

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

4/30/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, AMINATA WILLIAMS

1/17/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, AMINATA WILLIAMS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

4/23/2020: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

4/23/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, PATRICIA MILBURN

1/17/2020: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, PATRICIA MILBURN

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.8288.506 / 2020035008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF KENISSA DULANEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF KENISSA DULANEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FROM AMINATA WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, AMINATA WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, RAYMOND MILBURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, PATRICIA MILBURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, AMINATA WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MURPHY, KELLY D ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/17/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CA 000074

    Read MoreRead Less