This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/04/2022 at 18:04:28 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs. SIMPKINS, CALVIN V JR

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SIMPKINS, CALVIN. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********6353

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

SIMPKINS, CALVIN V JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKETT, BRETT H

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/4/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

11/4/2021: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCOURT ORDERED PAYMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingDate time: 12/10/2021 10:00 AM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM; Result: PRE-TRIAL HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (12/10/2021 PTC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 11/5/2021; Receipt Number: 2021085774; Applied Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 12/10/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021085774

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: BURKETT, BRETT H ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/05/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 SC 006353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKETT BRETT H