This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 09/07/2021 at 18:08:38 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs. MAI, KARL E

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against MAI, KARL E. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DICKSON, BARRY EARL JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3732

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DICKSON, BARRY EARL JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

MAI, KARL E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKETT, BRETT H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketANSWER FROM DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketINITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 7/9/2021; Receipt Number: 2021053694; Applied Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021053694

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: BURKETT, BRETT H ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDICKSON, BARRY EARL JR: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CC 003732

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKETT BRETT H