This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 09/06/2021 at 18:08:54 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs. CASSON, MICHAEL A

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASSON, MICHAEL A. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3700

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

CASSON, MICHAEL A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BURKETT, BRETT H

TEKELL, JONATHAN R

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

7/8/2021: COMPLAINT

PROPOSED SUMMONS

7/8/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingDate time: 9/17/2021 10:00 AM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 7/9/2021; Receipt Number: 2021053498; Applied Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 09/17/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021053498

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: BURKETT, BRETT H ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TEKELL, JONATHAN RICHARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKETT BRETT H