This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/17/2020 at 20:21:44 (UTC).

DILLON, HOWARD vs. EMERALD COAST STRUCTURES INC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 DILLON, HOWARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EMERALD COAST STRUCTURES INC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY and NOBLES, LINDA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0011

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY

NOBLES, LINDA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DILLON, HOWARD

Defendants

EMERALD COAST STRUCTURES INC

EMMER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURTT, MICHAEL SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

WADE, LINDA H

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT EMMER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

2/21/2020: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT EMMER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

COMPLAINT

1/6/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT EMMER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT EMMER DEVELOPENT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT EMMER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S EMMER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT, EMMER'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/15/2020; Receipt Number: 2020004064; Applied Amount: $17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/6/2020; Receipt Number: 2020001405; Applied Amount: $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2020001405

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketESERVICE@BURTTLAW.COM, JACKIE@BURTTLAW.COM, LWADE@WPSLAWYERS.COM, KGROVER@WPSLAWYERS.COM, MKIRKSEY@WPSLAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: BURTT, MICHAEL SCOTT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/06/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CA 000011

    Read MoreRead Less