This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/28/2022 at 18:18:58 (UTC).

DEREK A. FINGER D C P A vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 DEREK A FINGER D C P A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are [ V ] KINSEY, PAT and KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5302

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

[ V ] KINSEY, PAT

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEREK A. FINGER D C P A

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINER, MELISSA R

Defendant Attorney

GREENWALD, JENNA SELSKY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • HearingDate time: 11/18/2022 10:00 AM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PERMIT ADDITIONAL REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS RE: DEFENDANT'S "DEMAND LETTER" AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES RE: DEFENDANT'S "DEMAND LETTER" AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE RE: DEFENDANT'S "DEMAND LETTER" AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS RE: DEFENDANT'S "DEMAND LETTER" AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: GREENWALD, JENNA SELSKY ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PRCEDURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/29/2022; Receipt Number: 2022073687; Applied Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 11/18/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022073687

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: WINER, MELISSA R ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/29/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 SC 005302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNA GREENWALD