Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/20/2021 at 18:10:08 (UTC).

DANCAESCU, LUCIAN G vs. SILKY SAND LLC

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 DANCAESCU, LUCIAN G filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SILKY SAND LLC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBINSON, COLEMAN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0379

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANCAESCU, LUCIAN G

Defendants

STEWART, LORI

SILKY SAND LLC

STEWART, GREG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAYLOR, DARRYL STEVE JR

 

Court Documents

LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8475.1250 / 2021022617)

3/3/2021: LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8475.1250 / 2021022617)

COMPLAINT

2/18/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 3/3/2021; Receipt Number: 2021014906; Applied Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8475.1250 / 2021022617)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $1.00 RECEIPT #2021014906

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 2/19/2021; Receipt Number: 2021011854; Applied Amount: $1,948.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketFIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $1,948.00 RECEIPT #2021011854

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketTED@BOROWSKI-TRAYLOR.COM, STEVE@BOROWSKI-TRAYLOR.COM, MARYANN@BOROWSKI-TRAYLOR.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: TRAYLOR, DARRYL STEVE JR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketROBINSON, COLEMAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/19/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketLISPENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAYLOR, DARRYL STEVE JR