This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 12/15/2022 at 19:10:11 (UTC).

CURRIE, SETH vs. FRIDAY, ASHLEY B

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 CURRIE, SETH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FRIDAY, ASHLEY B. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ YL ] MCIVER (YL), KEITH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3435

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ YL ] MCIVER (YL), KEITH A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CURRIE, SETH

Respondent

FRIDAY, ASHLEY B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WHIBBS, GREGORY M

Respondent Attorney

REMINGTON, SCOTT A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE - Recorded (OR.8885.1779 / 2022108631)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCHECK LIST FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SPECIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITHOUT A HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketSPECIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITHOUT A HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE- PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT- SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/22/2022; Receipt Number: 2022071754; Applied Amount: $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $408.00 RECEIPT #2022071754

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S ATTORNEY: WHIBBS, GREGORY M ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketMCIVER (YL), KEITH A: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/16/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 DR 003435

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less