This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/19/2021 at 18:52:14 (UTC).

COLE, OLIVIA vs. ENGEL, JOHNATHON

Case Summary

On 05/24/2017 COLE, OLIVIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ENGEL, JOHNATHON. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURNS, JEFFREY LEONARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0773

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURNS, JEFFREY LEONARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLE, OLIVIA

Defendant

ENGEL, JOHNATHON

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (DUPLICATE)

2/15/2019: ORDER SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (DUPLICATE)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

9/7/2017: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WITH AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHMENT

6/19/2017: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WITH AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHMENT

ENTRY OF DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ENTERED JUNE 20,2017 AS TO JOHNATHON ENGEL

6/19/2017: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ENTERED JUNE 20,2017 AS TO JOHNATHON ENGEL

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/19/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

COMPLAINT

5/24/2017: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (DUPLICATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketORDER SETTING MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 5/8/2019 @ 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WITH AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ENTERED JUNE 20,2017 AS TO JOHNATHON ENGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 5/24/2017; Receipt Number: 2017054862; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017054862

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketBBAKER@BAKERLAWFLORIDA.COM, WL@BAKERLAWEMAIL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: BAKER, WIILLIAM C JR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketDUNCAN, J. SCOTT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/24/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CA 000773

    Read MoreRead Less