This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/27/2021 at 19:30:55 (UTC).

CITY OF PENSACOLA vs. J MILLER CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 CITY OF PENSACOLA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against J MILLER CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BERGOSH, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2321

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BERGOSH, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF PENSACOLA

Defendants

J MILLER CONSTRUCTION INC

HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ACEVEDO, CONSUELO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARSONS, ELIZABETH A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DECALRATORY RELIEF AND DECREE AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

7/29/2021: COMPLAINT FOR DECALRATORY RELIEF AND DECREE AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 7/30/2021; Receipt Number: 2021059509; Applied Amount: $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2021059509

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEPARSONS@WHSF-LAW.COM, PATRICIA@WHSBF-LAW.COM, SANDRA@WHSF-LAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: PARSONS, ELIZABETH A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECALRATORY RELIEF AND DECREE AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/29/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002321

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CITY OF PENSACOLA FLORIDA is a litigant