This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/07/2021 at 15:00:27 (UTC).

CDM ENVIROMENTAL LLC vs. TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 CDM ENVIROMENTAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5746

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CDM ENVIROMENTAL LLC

Defendant

TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEADER, MICHAEL D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingDate time: 11/16/2021 2:30 PM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (11/16/2021 PTC) - INSURANCE COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 10/12/2021; Receipt Number: 2021078761; Applied Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 11/16/2021 AT 2:30 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021078761

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: LEADER, MICHAEL D ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/11/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 SC 005746

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CDM ENVIROMENTAL LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF HANAN ASSAYAG AND BELLA GRUSHKO is a litigant

Latest cases where Tower Hill Prime Ins Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leader, Michael David