This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/01/2023 at 19:10:09 (UTC).

HARP, MICHAEL O vs. RICHARD G SELLERS MD PA

Case Summary

On 08/03/2023 HARP, MICHAEL O filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against RICHARD G SELLERS MD PA. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ N-CIVIL ] FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2279

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ N-CIVIL ] FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARP, MICHAEL O

HARP, JULIE

Defendants

RICHARD G SELLERS MD PA

ORTHO FLORIDA LLC

SELLERS, RICHARD G M D

ORTHO ONN LLC

FLORIDA PATIENTS COMPENSATION FUND (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

CHILDRENS ORTHOPAEDIC INSTITUTE OF NW FLORIDA (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

ORTHOPAEDIC SPINE INSTITUTE OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HADDAD, PHILIP GREGORY

Defendant Attorneys

COUSINS, ROBERT J

WITHERS, ASHLEY P

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY

10/17/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY

DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

10/16/2023: DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO ORTHO ONN, LLC

10/16/2023: DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO ORTHO ONN, LLC

DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.SDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO ORTHO ONN, LLC

10/16/2023: DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.SDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO ORTHO ONN, LLC

DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICARE REPORTING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/16/2023: DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICARE REPORTING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/16/2023: DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ELECTRONIC MEDIA INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/16/2023: DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ELECTRONIC MEDIA INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/16/2023: DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS,RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COLLATERAL SOURCEINTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/16/2023: DEFENDANTS,RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COLLATERAL SOURCEINTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A., ANSWER, MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

10/16/2023: DEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A., ANSWER, MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/5/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RICHARD G SELLERS MD AND RICHARD G SELLERS MD PA AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

9/27/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT RICHARD G SELLERS MD AND RICHARD G SELLERS MD PA AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FOR RICHARD G SELLERS MD PA

9/27/2023: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FOR RICHARD G SELLERS MD PA

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FOR RICHARD G SELLERS MD

9/27/2023: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FOR RICHARD G SELLERS MD

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

9/27/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

DEFENDANT'S ORTHO FLORIDA LLC AND ORTHO ONN LLC MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO SATISFY FLORIDA PLEADING REQUIREMENTS AND FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

9/22/2023: DEFENDANT'S ORTHO FLORIDA LLC AND ORTHO ONN LLC MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO SATISFY FLORIDA PLEADING REQUIREMENTS AND FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

EMAIL DESIGNATION.

9/22/2023: EMAIL DESIGNATION.

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

9/22/2023: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO ORTHO ONN, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.SDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO ORTHO ONN, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICARE REPORTING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ELECTRONIC MEDIA INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS,RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A.S DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COLLATERAL SOURCEINTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS, RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D., AND RICHARD G. SELLERS, M.D. P.A., ANSWER, MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -- ISSUED WITH INCORRECT TIMEFRAME TO FILE RESPONSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -- ISSUED WITH INCORRECT TIMEFRAME TO FILE RESPONSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED -- ISSUED WITH INCORRECT TIMEFRAME TO FILE RESPONSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: HADDAD, PHILIP GREGORY ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketFRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketCASE FILED 08/03/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 002279

[+] Read More [-] Read Less