This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/06/2023 at 18:40:53 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC vs. SAMARAS, MICHAEL C II

Case Summary

On 09/07/2023 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SAMARAS, MICHAEL C II. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2704

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ LLC

Defendants

SAMARAS, MICHAEL C II

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL C SAMARAS II

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING INTERESTS BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST OR HAVING OR CLAIMING TO HAVE ANY RIGHT TITLE OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY HEREIN DESCRIBED

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VANSLETTE, JASON M

DANILYAN, IRINA

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $18.50 RECEIPT #2023074418

10/4/2023: PAYMENT $18.50 RECEIPT #2023074418

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/2/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/2/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

9/25/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

9/25/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

9/25/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

9/25/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $950.00 RECEIPT #2023068299

9/12/2023: PAYMENT $950.00 RECEIPT #2023068299

ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

9/12/2023: ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

9/7/2023: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/7/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/7/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/7/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

9/7/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/04/2023

FinancialReceipt Date: 10/4/2023; Receipt Number: 2023074418; Applied Amount: $18.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT $18.50 RECEIPT #2023074418

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketCASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

FinancialReceipt Date: 9/12/2023; Receipt Number: 2023068299; Applied Amount: $950.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketCASE FILED 09/07/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 002704

[+] Read More [-] Read Less