This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 06/22/2023 at 20:17:11 (UTC).

KAFFER, MITCHELL L vs. SPRING, DANTAI

Case Summary

On 03/24/2023 KAFFER, MITCHELL L filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SPRING, DANTAI. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1552

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAFFER, MITCHELL L

Defendants

SPRING, DANTAI

NATIONAL FREIGHT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDOSO, RYAN M

 

Court Documents

COVERSHEET

3/24/2023: COVERSHEET

COMPLAINT

3/24/2023: COMPLAINT

ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

4/5/2023: ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

5/10/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

05/11/2023

FinancialReceipt Date: 5/11/2023; Receipt Number: 2023036675; Applied Amount: $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketPAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2023036675

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

FinancialReceipt Date: 4/5/2023; Receipt Number: 2023026206; Applied Amount: $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023026206

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: CARDOSO, RYAN M ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN ...: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOVERSHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

DocketCASE FILED 03/24/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 001552

[+] Read More [-] Read Less