This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 07/31/2023 at 19:58:37 (UTC).

ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC vs. TAYLOR, ASHLEY R

Case Summary

On 05/02/2023 ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TAYLOR, ASHLEY R. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ N-CIVIL ] FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1831

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ N-CIVIL ] FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

TAYLOR, ASHLEY R

LOANPAL LLC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ASHLEY R TAYLOR (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

UNKNOWN TENANT 1 (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

UNKNOWN TENANT 2 (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANSLETTE, JASON M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/28/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORIGINAL NOTE

7/10/2023: ORIGINAL NOTE

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE

7/10/2023: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

7/3/2023: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

7/3/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

6/30/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES

6/30/2023: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

6/30/2023: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISPENSE MEDIATION REQUIREMENT

6/28/2023: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISPENSE MEDIATION REQUIREMENT

PROPOSED SUMMONS

5/2/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

5/2/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

5/2/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

5/2/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

5/2/2023: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

5/2/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 702.015(4)

5/2/2023: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 702.015(4)

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/2/2023: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/2/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISPENSE MEDIATION REQUIREMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISPENSE MEDIATION REQUIREMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 702.015(4)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/02/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 001831

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less