This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/02/2023 at 19:07:16 (UTC).

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. MCCALL, ELISABETH

Case Summary

On 08/04/2023 PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MCCALL, ELISABETH. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ N-CIVIL ] FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2292

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ N-CIVIL ] FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

MCCALL, ELISABETH

MCCALL, JOHN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELISABETH MCCALL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN MCCALL

STATE OF FLORIDA

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ULLMAN, ZACHARY Y

Defendant Attorney

LEIGH, CODEY L

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

8/24/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

8/28/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

CLERK OF COURTS ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE

8/21/2023: CLERK OF COURTS ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.9026.1389. / 2023066780)

8/17/2023: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.9026.1389. / 2023066780)

ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

8/15/2023: ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/15/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/15/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/15/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/15/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/15/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/15/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/15/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/15/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

8/4/2023: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

8/4/2023: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/4/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS

8/4/2023 - PROPOSED SUMMONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS

8/4/2023 - PROPOSED SUMMONS

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/28/2023

FinancialReceipt Date: 8/28/2023; Receipt Number: 2023064620; Applied Amount: $20.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketPAYMENT $20.50 RECEIPT #2023064620

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketCASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK OF COURTS ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.9026.1389. / 2023066780)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketCASE FILED 08/04/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 002292

[+] Read More [-] Read Less