This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 17:02:43 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs. WILLIAMS, JOHN C

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAMS, JOHN C. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are [ V ] RITCHIE, SCOTT and RITCHIE, SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0191

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

[ V ] RITCHIE, SCOTT

RITCHIE, SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant

WILLIAMS, JOHN C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT- BREACH OF CONTRACT

1/11/2023: COMPLAINT- BREACH OF CONTRACT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingDate time: 2/8/2023 1:00 PM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: RITCHIE, SCOTT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 02/08/2023 AT 1:00 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: RITCHIE, SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/12/2023; Receipt Number: 2023002703; Applied Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023002703

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketRITCHIE, SCOTT: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT- BREACH OF CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less