This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 08/07/2022 at 18:27:40 (UTC).

CALOGERO, KYONG vs. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 CALOGERO, KYONG filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1109

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALOGERO, KYONG

CALOGERO, ANTHONY

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIBERMAN, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

6/9/2022: COMPLAINT

ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

6/14/2022: ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 6/14/2022; Receipt Number: 2022044918; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSERVICE@ILGPA.COM, LEVI@ILGPA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022044918

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: BIBERMAN, MICHAEL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN ...: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCITON TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/09/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001109

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Biberman