This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/20/2022 at 19:11:55 (UTC).

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC vs. MASSEY, DAVID

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MASSEY, DAVID. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, PAT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********7280

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, PAT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC

Defendant

MASSEY, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA B

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

12/17/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

12/20/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketPRETRIAL WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingDate time: 2/9/2022 10:00 AM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: KINSEY, PAT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM; Result: PRE-TRIAL HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED (02/09/2022 PTC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 12/20/2021; Receipt Number: 2021097292; Applied Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 02/09/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN DIV V/ , JDG: KINSEY, PAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021097292

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MOEHLE, KRISTINA B ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketKINSEY, PAT: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B