This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/19/2022 at 01:42:04 (UTC).

BROOKS, SHIRLEY vs. BROOKS, BILLIE JR

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 BROOKS, SHIRLEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BROOKS, BILLIE JR. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER, JOHN L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3326

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER, JOHN L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BROOKS, SHIRLEY

Respondent

BROOKS, BILLIE JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

YORK, LISA K

Respondent Attorney

RYBA, GAYLE J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE- PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY: RYBA, GAYLE J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE- RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $418.00 RECEIPT #2021069394

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION AS TO SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER'S ATTORNEY: YORK, LISA K ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMILLER, JOHN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER/WIFE'S NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYBA, GAYLE J