This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/07/2021 at 20:44:38 (UTC).

BONE, LINDA C vs. HARBOUR POINTE OF PERDIDO KEY CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 BONE, LINDA C filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against HARBOUR POINTE OF PERDIDO KEY CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHACKELFORD, JAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0730

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHACKELFORD, JAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BONE, LINDA C

Defendant

HARBOUR POINTE OF PERDIDO KEY CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINSHEW, LISA S

Defendant Attorney

STRATTON, JOHN M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/10/2020: COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT

6/10/2020: EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT B-G TO COMPLAINT

6/10/2020: EXHIBIT B-G TO COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020040676

6/11/2020: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020040676

CORRESPONDENCE OF LISA MINSHEW PA REQUESTING ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

8/4/2020: CORRESPONDENCE OF LISA MINSHEW PA REQUESTING ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/4/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

9/28/2020: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF VIRTUAL HEARING

12/17/2020: NOTICE OF VIRTUAL HEARING

PLAINTIFF LINDA C BONE'S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT HARBOUR POINTE TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/24/2021: PLAINTIFF LINDA C BONE'S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT HARBOUR POINTE TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/4/2021: DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT

ORDER ON DEFENDANT, HARBOUR POINTE OF PERDIDO KEY CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS

2/12/2021: ORDER ON DEFENDANT, HARBOUR POINTE OF PERDIDO KEY CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS

ATTORNEY'S COVER LETTER

2/12/2021: ATTORNEY'S COVER LETTER

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO HARBOUR POINTE'S MOTION TO DISMISS DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT

2/10/2021: MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO HARBOUR POINTE'S MOTION TO DISMISS DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT HARBOUR POINTE AT PERDIDO KEY CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

9/14/2020: DEFENDANT HARBOUR POINTE AT PERDIDO KEY CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

FIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT

8/4/2020: FIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VIRTUAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketJSTRATTON@BECKERLAWYERS.COM, AJOHNSON@BECKERLAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT HARBOUR POINTE AT PERDIDO KEY CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 8/5/2020; Receipt Number: 2020053463; Applied Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020053463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketFIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE OF LISA MINSHEW PA REQUESTING ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 6/11/2020; Receipt Number: 2020040676; Applied Amount: $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020040676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MINSHEW, LISA S ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/11/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CA 000730

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT B-G TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINSHEW, LISA S