This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/31/2021 at 17:36:49 (UTC).

BOLAND, JAMES M II vs. SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC

Case Summary

On 06/27/2018 BOLAND, JAMES M II filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHACKELFORD, JAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1009

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHACKELFORD, JAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOLAND, JAMES M II

Defendant

SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEAN, WILLIAM A.

Defendant Attorney

GONZALEZ, THOMAS F

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

6/27/2018: COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATOREIS TO DEFENDANT SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC D/B/A SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA

6/27/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATOREIS TO DEFENDANT SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC D/B/A SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA

DEFENDANT, SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JAMES M. BOLAND II

7/20/2018: DEFENDANT, SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JAMES M. BOLAND II

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

7/24/2018: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

9/4/2018: PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT, SELECT SPECIALITY HOSPITAL'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

9/4/2018: DEFENDANT, SELECT SPECIALITY HOSPITAL'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT, SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITALS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

9/7/2018: DEFENDANT, SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITALS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OFACCEPTATNCE OF DEFENDANTS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

11/1/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OFACCEPTATNCE OF DEFENDANTS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

12/6/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OFACCEPTATNCE OF DEFENDANTS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF JAMES M. BOLAND II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF MARY STEPHENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITALS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT, SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, SELECT SPECIALITY HOSPITAL'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketBILL@FORDDEAN.COM, ZEE@FORDDEAN.COM, SERVICE@FORDDEAN.COM, TFG@BEGGSLANE.COM, RLF@BEGGSLANE.COM, DND@BEGGSLANE.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA, INC. D/B/A SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATOREIS TO DEFENDANT SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC D/B/A SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: DEAN, WILLIAM A. ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/27/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 CA 001009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dean, William A