This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/10/2021 at 22:16:00 (UTC).

BLUM, LARRY W vs. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 BLUM, LARRY W filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANNHEISSER., THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1190

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

 

Party Details

Defendants

FLUOR DANIEL ILLINOIS INC

RUBBER & SPECIALTIES INC

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC

GRINNELL LLC

PERFECTION HY TEST COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY

EATON CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY

PNEUMO ABEX LLC, INDIVIDUALLY

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

FLUOR ENTERPRISES INC

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

RIC WIL INC

WARREN PUMPS LLC

FLOWSERVE US INC SOLELY AS SUCCESSOR TO ROCKWELL MANUFACTURING CO

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, THE

JOY TECHNOLOGIES INC

DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

VIACOMCBS INC

VIMASCO CORPORATION

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

CHUNG TIMS, MELANIE ERICA

STEVENS, SCOTT D

MARSTON, DAVID W JR

MELARAGNO, PETER J

SALAZAR, DANIELA CAROLINA

GUADAGNOLO, RICHARD DAVID II

CRUMP, RICHARD M

LOPEZ, FRANCES

BRISCOE, EDWARD J

COLLINGS, CHRISTOPHER JM

Other Attorneys

MCGUINNESS, STEPHEN A MR

PAZOS, LUCIA V

IOVINO, CAROLINE MARIE

MEDINA, EDUARDO J

COHEN, STUART L

MCGOWAN, CASEY

PASSARO, GERALYN M MRS

UPSHAW, ANTHONY N

BESSERMAN, DAWN MARIE

MATTHEWS, LOGAN TAYLOR

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/6/2020: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CARRIER CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/6/2020: CARRIER CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/6/2020: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/6/2020: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

FLUOR CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/6/2020: FLUOR CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF IT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

11/6/2020: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF IT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

DEFENDANT JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

10/29/2020: DEFENDANT JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING LLC TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

10/29/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING LLC TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

PERFECTION HY-TEST COMPANYS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/15/2020: PERFECTION HY-TEST COMPANYS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF JACK WILLIAMS

12/21/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF JACK WILLIAMS

DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC'S REQEST FOR COPIES

12/16/2020: DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC'S REQEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF RONNIE MORRIS

12/15/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF RONNIE MORRIS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND EMAIL DESIGNATIONS

12/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND EMAIL DESIGNATIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF TOMMY OWENS

12/11/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF TOMMY OWENS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, CARRIER CORPORATION, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS, INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR CORPORATION, FLUOR DANIEL ILLINOIS, INC., FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, HERCULES LLC, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., MORSE TEC LLC, PERFECTION HY-TEST COMPANY, ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

12/10/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, CARRIER CORPORATION, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS, INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR CORPORATION, FLUOR DANIEL ILLINOIS, INC., FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, HERCULES LLC, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., MORSE TEC LLC, PERFECTION HY-TEST COMPANY, ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/2/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF POSTPONEMENT OF THE VIDEO DEPOSTION OF RONNIE MORRIS

11/20/2020: NOTICE OF POSTPONEMENT OF THE VIDEO DEPOSTION OF RONNIE MORRIS

NOTICE OF POSTPONEMENT OF THE VIDEO DEPOSTION OF TOMMY OWNES

11/20/2020: NOTICE OF POSTPONEMENT OF THE VIDEO DEPOSTION OF TOMMY OWNES

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET CASE FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL CASE FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE THAT ACTION IS AT ISSUE AND READY TO BE SET FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF JACK WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC'S REQEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS CROSS-NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF TOMMY OWENS AND DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS CROSS-NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF RONNIE MORRIS AND DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION OF RONNIE MORRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
355 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases where ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY is a litigant