This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 12/03/2021 at 18:33:32 (UTC).

BILL WALTHER ROOFING INC A FLORDIA CORPORATION vs. ENGLE, DONNA BRADLEY

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 BILL WALTHER ROOFING INC A FLORDIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ENGLE, DONNA BRADLEY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANNHEISSER., THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2762

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BILL WALTHER ROOFING INC A FLORDIA CORPORATION

Defendant

ENGLE, DONNA BRADLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOCKLIN, OSCAR JACKSON JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketINITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER- GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ENTERED 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.8636.1039 / 2021111350)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 10/8/2021; Receipt Number: 2021078095; Applied Amount: $415.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $415.00 RECEIPT #2021078095

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketJLOCKLIN@LJSLAWFIRM.COM, SHIRL@LJSLAWFIRM.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: LOCKLIN, OSCAR JACKSON JR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDANNHEISSER., THOMAS: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/05/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002762

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BILL WALTHER ROOFING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCKLIN, OSCAR JACKSON JR