Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/13/2021 at 15:29:06 (UTC).

BARNETT SOUTHERN CORPORATION vs. SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 BARNETT SOUTHERN CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHACKELFORD, JAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0609

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHACKELFORD, JAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARNETT SOUTHERN CORPORATION

Defendants

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND/ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

ATLANTIC MERIDIAN CONTRACTING CORPORATION

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

THE CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUKEN, S ELYSHA

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF BARNETT SOUTHERN CORPORATIONS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ATLANTIC MERIDIAN CONTRACTING CORPORATION

3/18/2021: PLAINTIFF BARNETT SOUTHERN CORPORATIONS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ATLANTIC MERIDIAN CONTRACTING CORPORATION

PLAINTIFF BARNETT SOUTHERN CORPORATION'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC

3/18/2021: PLAINTIFF BARNETT SOUTHERN CORPORATION'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC

COMPLAINT

3/16/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 3/18/2021; Receipt Number: 2021019536; Applied Amount: $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF BARNETT SOUTHERN CORPORATIONS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ATLANTIC MERIDIAN CONTRACTING CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2021019536

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF BARNETT SOUTHERN CORPORATION'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 3/17/2021; Receipt Number: 2021019431; Applied Amount: $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketFIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000609

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC MERIDIAN CONTRACTING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where SKANSKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC is a litigant