Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/26/2021 at 15:09:31 (UTC).

BALKUM, RICKIE T vs. ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 BALKUM, RICKIE T filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BERGOSH, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0459

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BERGOSH, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALKUM, RICKIE T

Defendant

ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANDELL, SCOTT EVAN

Defendant Attorney

PALMER, ELIZABETH NICOLE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/26/2021: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 3/2/2021; Receipt Number: 2021014709; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021014709

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSCOTT@KKPFIRM.COM, ALL@KKPFIRM.COM, NPALMER@WPSLAWYERS.COM, JBOLING@WPSLAWYERS.COM, CSCHREINER@WPSLAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: KANDELL, SCOTT EVAN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/26/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000459

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALMER, ELIZABETH NICOLE