This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/11/2023 at 12:58:49 (UTC).

ASH, CARMEN vs. FLORIDA SE, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 ASH, CARMEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FLORIDA SE, LLC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ F ] DANNHEISSER., THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0936

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ F ] DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASH, CARMEN

Defendant

FLORIDA SE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEE, CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

DARENEAU, NICHOLAS P

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

6/7/2019: COMPLAINT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.8265.1177 / 2020023630)

3/18/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.8265.1177 / 2020023630)

 

Docket Entries

03/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.8265.1177 / 2020023630)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2020

DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2020

DocketCASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2020

DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2020

DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2020

DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019

DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2019

DocketNOTICE THAT CASE IS AT ISSUE AND NOTICE FOR TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2019

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2019

DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
06/07/2019

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019

DocketCHUCK@GEEANDLEE.COM, JOHN.RINE@LEWISBRISBOIS.COM, FLCOURTMAIL@LEWISBRISBOIS.COM, KAREN.HALSEY@LEWISBRISBOIS.COM, NICHOLAS.DARENEAU@LEWISBRISBOIS.COM, FLCOURTMAIL@LEWISBRISBOIS.COM, ROBIN.GARCIA@LEWISBRISBOIS.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019

DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019

DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019

DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019

DocketBURNS, JEFFREY LEONARD: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2019

DocketCASE FILED 06/07/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CA 000936

[+] Read More [-] Read Less