This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/02/2023 at 18:26:32 (UTC).

AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC vs. UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES SURVIVING SPOUSE GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF JEREMY MITTLESTEADT

Case Summary

On 03/03/2023 AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES SURVIVING SPOUSE GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF JEREMY MITTLESTEADT. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ N-CIVIL ] FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0374

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ N-CIVIL ] FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES SURVIVING SPOUSE GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF JEREMY MITTLESTEADT

MITTLESTEADT, PAMELA LYNN

MITTLESTEADT, KURT ALAN

TWIN PINES OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 1 IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY

UNKNOWN TENANT 2 IN POSSESSION OF THE PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARIAS, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

3/23/2023: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

3/20/2023: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

3/7/2023: ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

COMPLAINT

3/3/2023: COMPLAINT

ANSWER FROM KURT MITTLESTEADT

5/1/2023: ANSWER FROM KURT MITTLESTEADT

CORRESPONDENCE FILED

4/18/2023: CORRESPONDENCE FILED

RETURN OF UNEXCUTED SUMMONS

4/14/2023: RETURN OF UNEXCUTED SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH

4/14/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE UNKNOWN HEIRS & BENEFICIARIES

4/14/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE UNKNOWN HEIRS & BENEFICIARIES

NOTICE OF ACTION- SUN PRESS

4/14/2023: NOTICE OF ACTION- SUN PRESS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

4/12/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

4/12/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

4/12/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

4/12/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

4/12/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

ANSWER FROM PAMELA L. MITTLESTEADT - DUPLICATE

4/12/2023: ANSWER FROM PAMELA L. MITTLESTEADT - DUPLICATE

ANSWER FROM PAMELA L. MITTLESTEADT

4/10/2023: ANSWER FROM PAMELA L. MITTLESTEADT

LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8949.159 / 2023022557)

3/23/2023: LISPENDENS - Recorded (OR.8949.159 / 2023022557)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FROM KURT MITTLESTEADT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF UNEXCUTED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE UNKNOWN HEIRS & BENEFICIARIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION- SUN PRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLISPENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/03/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 000374

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less