This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/20/2023 at 17:06:53 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs. HUGHES, TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUGHES, TAYLOR. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are [ V ] RITCHIE, SCOTT and RITCHIE, SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0103

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

[ V ] RITCHIE, SCOTT

RITCHIE, SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

HUGHES, TAYLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKETT, BRETT H

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/5/2023: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

1/5/2023: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • HearingDate time: 2/8/2023 1:00 PM; Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE; Judge: RITCHIE, SCOTT; Location: DIVISION V COURT ROOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY JUDGE SET FOR 02/08/2023 AT 1:00 PM IN DIV V/ , JDG: RITCHIE, SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/9/2023; Receipt Number: 2023001672; Applied Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2023001672

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: BURKETT, BRETT H ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketRITCHIE, SCOTT: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less