This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/19/2022 at 18:17:18 (UTC).

ALLENBACK, AIMEE vs. CORELOGIC CREDCO LLC

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 ALLENBACK, AIMEE filed an Other lawsuit against CORELOGIC CREDCO LLC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ N-CIVIL ] WILLIAMS, THOMAS H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1793

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ N-CIVIL ] WILLIAMS, THOMAS H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLENBACK, AIMEE

ALLENBACK ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHER SIMILARLY SITUATED CONSUMERS, AIMEE

Defendant

CORELOGIC CREDCO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORNARO, MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

9/20/2022: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/21/2022; Receipt Number: 2022071311; Applied Amount: $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $408.00 RECEIPT #2022071311

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketMFORNARO@FORNAROLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: FORNARO, MATTHEW ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: FORNARO, MATTHEW ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketWILLIAMS, THOMAS H: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/20/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001793

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CoreLogic Credco LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORNARO, MATTHEW