This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/12/2021 at 19:46:55 (UTC).

ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATED vs. KING, KREG W

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATED filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KING, KREG W. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHACKELFORD, JAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1354

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHACKELFORD, JAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEGIANT PARTNERS INCORPORATED

Defendant

KING, KREG W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOLAND, HOWARD STEVEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketRETURN/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 10/14/2020; Receipt Number: 2020069094; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020069094

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketHTOLAND@MITRANI.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR PRE-JUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: TOLAND, HOWARD STEVEN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/14/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CA 001354

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allegiant Partners Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOWARD TOLAND