This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 06/15/2023 at 19:39:04 (UTC).

ADAMS, MARGUERITE L vs. CHRIS JONES PROPERTY APPRAISER FOR ESCAMBIA COUNTY

Case Summary

On 12/03/2009 ADAMS, MARGUERITE L filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against CHRIS JONES PROPERTY APPRAISER FOR ESCAMBIA COUNTY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ K ] TERRELL, TERRY D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********4129

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ K ] TERRELL, TERRY D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROLLINS, THOMAS G

LIPPE, MIRIAM J

STRAIN, SHARON K

SALES, WILLEAN B

ADAMS, ROBERT L

CONNER, MARY ELIZABETH TRUSTEE

KENNEDY, ROBERT W TRUSTEE

CDM, LLC

TRYON, JANET H

MARCHITELLI, JENNIFER R

CAMPAGNE, JILL STRAIN

PETTUS, CAROL ANN TRUSTEE

CHAPMAN, JAN S

BRUDER, CAROLYN REITZ

FALBO, TINA M

BROWN, RICHARD W

MONTGOMERY, DAVID A

FOLEY, MICHAEL J

BROWER, GERALDINE W

CHRISTOFF, A. KATHLEEN, TRUSTEE

2,983 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FINDLEY, THOMAS M

DEARING, KATIE L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

12/3/2009: COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS

2/1/2011: ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS ONLY

6/17/2014: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS ONLY

ATTACHMENT "A" -- LIST OF PLAINTIFFS FOR DISMISSAL

6/17/2014: ATTACHMENT "A" -- LIST OF PLAINTIFFS FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY CERTAIN PLTS ONLY

6/23/2014: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY CERTAIN PLTS ONLY

ATTACHMENT "A" TO NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

6/23/2014: ATTACHMENT "A" TO NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS ONLY

6/27/2014: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS ONLY

ATTACHMENT "A" LIST OF PLAINTIFFS FOR DISMISSAL

6/27/2014: ATTACHMENT "A" LIST OF PLAINTIFFS FOR DISMISSAL

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS ONLY

7/2/2014: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BY CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS ONLY

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2014
View Court Documents

DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.7240.1763 / 2014075102)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2014

DocketCASE LAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2014

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2014

DocketCASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2014

DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2014

DocketORDER GRANTING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2014
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL STIPULATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2014

DocketPROPOSED ORDER GRANTING COUNSELS MOTION TO WITHDRAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2014

DocketNOTICE OF RESET HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2014

DocketCLERK'S MEMO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
01/19/2011

DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION CRCIVIL NOTICE OF LOP W/BARCD SENT ON: 01/19/2011 15:38:00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2010

DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2010

DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2009

DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2009
View Court Documents

DocketACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2009

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY (2) CRCIVIL SUMMONS W/BARCD SENT ON: 12/08/2009 14:52:02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2009

DocketISSUANCE OF SUMMONS RECEIPT: 1091441 DATE: 12/04/2009

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2009

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2009

DocketCIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE RECEIPT: 1091441 DATE: 12/04/2009

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2009
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT/PETITION FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less