This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 11/16/2022 at 22:05:55 (UTC).

YAMASA CO LTD VS DEIDRE GREEN CHAVIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2022 YAMASA CO LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DEIDRE GREEN CHAVIS. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ECKLEY-MOULDER, KELLY E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAMASA CO LTD

Po Box 4300

Scottsdale, AZ 85261

Defendants

SAVANNAH CAMPBELL

Jacksonville, FL 32244

DEIDRE GREEN CHAVIS

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cruikshank, Elizabeth Marie

6065 Roswell Rd Ste 680

Atlanta, GA 30328-4011

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

9/25/2022- D2- COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

9/25/2022- D4- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

9/25/2022- D5- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR SAVANNAH CAMPBELL

9/25/2022- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR SAVANNAH CAMPBELL

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEIDA GREEN-CHAVIS

9/25/2022- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEIDA GREEN-CHAVIS

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR SAVANNAH CAMPBELL

9/28/2022- D3- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR SAVANNAH CAMPBELL

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4245751

9/28/2022- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4245751

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/17/22 @ 9:50PM TO DEIDRE GREEN- CHAVIS, POSTED - PLAINTIFF

10/18/2022- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/17/22 @ 9:50PM TO DEIDRE GREEN- CHAVIS, POSTED - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/17/22 @ 9:50PM TO SAVANNAH CAMPBELL, POSTED - PLAINTIFF

10/18/2022- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/17/22 @ 9:50PM TO SAVANNAH CAMPBELL, POSTED - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/19/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/17/22 @ 9:50PM TO SAVANNAH CAMPBELL, POSTED - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/19/2022; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 10/17/22 @ 9:50PM TO DEIDRE GREEN- CHAVIS, POSTED - PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4245751

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR SAVANNAH CAMPBELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEIDA GREEN-CHAVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR SAVANNAH CAMPBELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR DEIDRE GREEN CHAVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2022; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (RESIDENTIAL) (NON-MONETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YAMASA CO, LTD, A JAPANESE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK