This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/17/2023 at 21:01:35 (UTC).

XYLEM VS METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 XYLEM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS LLC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEARING, KATIE L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEARING, KATIE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XYLEM

Defendant

METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gebeloff, Stephen Benjamin

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR DEFT

11/15/2022- D23- ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR DEFT

NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) ON 11/01/2022 @1130AM VIA ZOOM

8/2/2022- D22- NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) ON 11/01/2022 @1130AM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF HEARING 11/01/2022 11:30 AM IN ROOM 703

7/20/2022- D21- NOTICE OF HEARING 11/01/2022 11:30 AM IN ROOM 703

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR DEFT MODIFICATION

6/30/2022- D20- MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR DEFT MODIFICATION

MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT -IMPASSE

5/5/2022- D19- MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT -IMPASSE

CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY (DEFENDANTS' MEDIATION)

4/25/2022- D18- CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY (DEFENDANTS' MEDIATION)

SECOND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

3/18/2022- D17- SECOND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED/ ON 5/5/22 AT 1:30PM VIA ZOOM

3/17/2022- D16- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED/ ON 5/5/22 AT 1:30PM VIA ZOOM

CERTIFICATE (DEFT'S MEDIATION) OF AUTHORITY

2/14/2022- D15- CERTIFICATE (DEFT'S MEDIATION) OF AUTHORITY

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/28/2023; DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 20725 PAGE 659-660 RECORDED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2023; RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE TO METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, LLC.- JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 20725 PAGE 659-660

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2023; ORDER OF JUDICIAL DEFAULT ON METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2023; MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/16/2022; ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR DEFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/2/2022; NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) ON 11/01/2022 @1130AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; NOTICE OF HEARING 11/01/2022 11:30 AM IN ROOM 703

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2022; MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEYS OF RECORD FOR DEFT MODIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2022; MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT -IMPASSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/14/2021; MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFT METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS LLCS) TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CATHERINE DURANT DECUNTO FOR METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2021; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE - METRIC CIVIL CONTRUCTORS LLC - 01/21/21 12:31PM - SERVED: MARY MARUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialDescription: CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed: $401.00; Paid: $401.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • FinancialDescription: SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed: $10.00; Paid: $10.00; Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3792439

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2021; COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED TO METRIC CIVIL CONSTRUCTORS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2021; COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2021; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less